This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 08:26:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3714

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

KALAYEDJIAN BEDROS

Pasadena, CA 91104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ANNA LAURA M.

Defendant Attorney

BAYLEY GUY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS

2/18/2022: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/11/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

4/8/2022: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

4/8/2022: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/04/2022; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN (Defendant); As to: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BEDROS KALAYEDJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD