This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 04:42:51 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS ANNA RSHTUNI

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANNA RSHTUNI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6710

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

RSHTUNI ANNA

Glendale, CA 91222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

10/20/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Rshtuni (Defendant); Service Date: 10/26/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Rshtuni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Rshtuni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Rshtuni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard