This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 02:45:19 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS VINCENT CORSO

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against VINCENT CORSO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1866

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN BEAUTY CONDOMINIUMS I OWNERS ASSOCIATION CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

CORSO VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

3/22/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

3/22/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/22/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/22/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

3/22/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

7/19/2022: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

1/3/2023: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/18/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, et al. on 07/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by American Beauty Condominiums I Owners Association as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: American Beauty Condominiums I Owners Association (Plaintiff); As to: VINCENT CORSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: American Beauty Condominiums I Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: VINCENT CORSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: VINCENT CORSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: VINCENT CORSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: VINCENT CORSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: VINCENT CORSO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less