This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 10:31:29 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS LILIANA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LILIANA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0446

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

GARCIA LILIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/10/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/10/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 02/25/2021

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 02/25/2021

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/17/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 02/10/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAddress for DANIEL MEDIONI (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 02/25/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Upinder S. Kalra; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: LILIANA GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: LILIANA GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: LILIANA GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David J. Cowan in Department 1 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M