This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 11:34:43 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS JOSANNE WAYMAN

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against JOSANNE WAYMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3212

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

WAYMAN JOSANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/10/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/10/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

5/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/10/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

6/20/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Answer - Answer

7/13/2022: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2025
  • Hearing05/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JOSANNE WAYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSANNE WAYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSANNE WAYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSANNE WAYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M