This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2022 at 06:01:21 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS JASON RYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against JASON RYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8080

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

RYAN JASON

RYAN ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/10/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/10/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/10/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/10/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/10/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

3/14/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/17/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Jason

7/20/2022: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Jason

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

7/19/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

7/19/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

Application for Publication - Application for Publication

7/19/2022: Application for Publication - Application for Publication

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2024
  • Hearing11/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder for Publication for Jason; Signed and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JASON RYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order for Publication for Jason: Filed By: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JASON RYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JASON RYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JASON RYAN (Defendant); ANGEL RYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JASON RYAN (Defendant); ANGEL RYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: JASON RYAN (Defendant); ANGEL RYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M