This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2021 at 22:57:43 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS HARRY M. JOHNSON, JR.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against HARRY M JOHNSON, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7267

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

JOHNSON HARRY M. JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/5/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/5/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/5/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/6/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 10/05/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAddress for DANIEL MEDIONI (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY M. JOHNSON, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY M. JOHNSON, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: HARRY M. JOHNSON, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M