This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 22:52:34 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS ERIC BARKER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against ERIC BARKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6011

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BARKER ERIC

RUSSUM TONIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/16/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/16/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/16/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

11/29/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/10/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • Hearing08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ERIC BARKER (Defendant); TONIE RUSSUM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to ERIC BARKER; TONIE RUSSUM; On the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 12/23/2021 to 12/23/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ERIC BARKER (Defendant); TONIE RUSSUM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket; Default not entered as to ERIC BARKER; TONIE RUSSUM; On the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ERIC BARKER (Defendant); Service Date: 11/06/2021; Service Cost: 285.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: TONIE RUSSUM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/06/2021; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ERIC BARKER (Defendant); TONIE RUSSUM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ERIC BARKER (Defendant); TONIE RUSSUM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ERIC BARKER (Defendant); TONIE RUSSUM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M