This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 06:05:06 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LIZBELD VALDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIZBELD VALDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0023

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

VALDEZ LIZBELD AKA LIZBELD VALDEZ DELACRUZ

VALDEZ CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE CALVIN F

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

12/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/30/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/30/2021

11/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/30/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • Hearing11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIZBELD VALDEZ (Defendant); CARLOS VALDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Randy Rhodes; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/30/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Karen Moskowitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIZBELD VALDEZ (Defendant); CARLOS VALDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIZBELD VALDEZ (Defendant); CARLOS VALDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LIZBELD VALDEZ (Defendant); CARLOS VALDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE CALVIN F.