This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 16:19:22 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JOHN PETERSON

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN PETERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1965

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

PETERSON JOHN AKA JOHN ROBERT PETERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE CALVIN F

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/3/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN PETERSON (Defendant); Service Date: 09/14/2021; Service Cost: 149.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN PETERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN PETERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN PETERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant