This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 21:21:59 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CYNTHIA GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYNTHIA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5959

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GONZALEZ CYNTHIA AKA CYNTHIA B. GONZALEZ

GONZALEZ DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE CALVIN F

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/6/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/6/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/6/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

10/6/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation on 10/06/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA GONZALEZ (Defendant); Service Date: 10/14/2021; Service Cost: 149.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL GONZALEZ (Defendant); Service Date: 10/16/2021; Service Cost: 149.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA GONZALEZ (Defendant); DANIEL GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA GONZALEZ (Defendant); DANIEL GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA GONZALEZ (Defendant); DANIEL GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: CYNTHIA GONZALEZ (Defendant); DANIEL GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE CALVIN F.