This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 09:09:15 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DANA WHITESIDE, JR.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANA WHITESIDE, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

WHITESIDE DANA JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAURIE JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/3/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

1/3/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

1/3/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

1/3/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

1/3/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2026
  • Hearing01/06/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/06/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DANA WHITESIDE, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DANA WHITESIDE, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: DANA WHITESIDE, JR. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less