This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 22:01:37 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS CINDY ARIAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CINDY ARIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7029

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ARIAS CINDY AKA CYNTHIA ARIAS

HERRERA JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/27/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/27/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

9/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/28/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/28/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CINDY ARIAS (Defendant); JOSE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CINDY ARIAS (Defendant); JOSE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CINDY ARIAS (Defendant); JOSE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CINDY ARIAS (Defendant); JOSE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CINDY ARIAS (Defendant); JOSE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: CINDY ARIAS (Defendant); JOSE HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT