This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 13:36:15 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS BEST BUY STORES, L.P, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST BUY STORES, L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8571

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs, Not Classified By Court and Defendants

BEST BUY STORES L.P

SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Not Classified By Court

SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M

Defendant Attorney

CLASSEN ROGER DEREK

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/16/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/10/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/10/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons (Cross)

1/31/2022: Summons - Summons (Cross)

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

1/31/2022: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

1/31/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

1/31/2022: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/3/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF VENUE

12/3/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF VENUE

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/3/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

12/3/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

12/3/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2024
  • Hearing12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC; On the Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket; Default not entered as to SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC; On the Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant) to SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BEST BUY STORES, L.P (Cross-Complainant); As to: SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: 02/07/2022; Service Cost: 264.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BEST BUY STORES, L.P (Defendant); SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BEST BUY STORES, L.P (Defendant); SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF VENUE; Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BEST BUY STORES, L.P (Defendant); SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: BEST BUY STORES, L.P (Defendant); SAAV APPLIANCE INSTALLERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST BUY STORES L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLASSEN ROGER DEREK