This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 12:07:34 (UTC).

BYRON FREEMAN VS MARTIN LUTHER KING JR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 BYRON FREEMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN LUTHER KING JR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0202

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEMAN BYRON

Defendant

MARTIN LUTHER KING JR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

3/10/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/10/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/09/2021

4/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/09/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/9/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/10/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

4/5/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Byron Freeman on 03/10/2021 as follows: Defendant Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital does not owe the plaintiff Byron Freeman any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/09/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 04/09/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Byron Freeman (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Byron Freeman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Byron Freeman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol: As To Parties changed from Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital (Defendant) to Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Martin Luther King Jr Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN LUTHER KING JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant