This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 04:26:14 (UTC).

BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6249

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. DBA BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DHARWADKAR SHILPA R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/26/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/26/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/26/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2024
  • Hearing08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Burlington Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Burlington Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Burlington Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Burlington Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DHARWADKAR SHILPA R.