This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 17:15:14 (UTC).

BRUNSING ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS STEVEN SIEGEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 BRUNSING ASSOCIATES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEVEN SIEGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5284

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUNSING ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

SIEGEL STEVEN

SIEGEL JULIE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVINE JAMES B.

Defendant Attorney

WHALEN DANIEL CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

9/7/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/20/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/20/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

7/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/20/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Steven Siegel (Defendant); Julie Siegel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brunsing Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Julie Siegel (Defendant); Service Date: 08/02/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brunsing Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Siegel (Defendant); Service Date: 08/13/2021; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brunsing Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Siegel (Defendant); Julie Siegel (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brunsing Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Siegel (Defendant); Julie Siegel (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brunsing Associates, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Steven Siegel (Defendant); Julie Siegel (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRUNSING ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHALEN DANIEL C.