Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 12:33:04 (UTC).

BRIDGER CLAIM SERIVCES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 BRIDGER CLAIM SERIVCES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6196

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIDGER CLAIM SERIVCES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SEVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

4/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • Hearing04/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bridger Claim Serivces, LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services Llc, A Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/27/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bridger Claim Serivces, LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services Llc, A Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bridger Claim Serivces, LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services Llc, A Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bridger Claim Serivces, LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services Llc, A Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bridger Claims Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL