This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 08:29:47 (UTC).

BRIANNA B. ROGERS VS LA FINE MOTORS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 BRIANNA B ROGERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LA FINE MOTORS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7779

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

ROGERS BRIANNA B.

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

LA FINE MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

LA FINE MOTORS LLC

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorney

SOSA CARLOS EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/17/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/17/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/17/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

12/5/2022: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

12/5/2022: Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

General Denial - General Denial

12/5/2022: General Denial - General Denial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/4/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2025
  • Hearing11/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2024
  • Hearing05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: LA FINE MOTORS LLC, a limited liability company (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: 12/16/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant); As to: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); LA Fine Motors, LLC (Defendant); LA FINE MOTORS LLC, a limited liability company (Cross-Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant); As to: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); LA Fine Motors, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant); Service Date: 11/23/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: LA Fine Motors, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/29/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: LA Fine Motors, LLC (Defendant); Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: LA Fine Motors, LLC (Defendant); Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brianna B. Rogers (Plaintiff); As to: LA Fine Motors, LLC (Defendant); Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E