Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 15:32:15 (UTC).

BRIAN WHITAKER VS LOS ANGELES UNITED INVESTMENT CO., LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 BRIAN WHITAKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNITED INVESTMENT CO , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1615

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITAKER BRIAN

Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNITED INVESTMENT CO. LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TACHTCHIAN KHATCHIK E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

Defendant Attorney

SAHELIAN ARA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

3/18/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference - Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference

3/18/2021: Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference - Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility

3/18/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/25/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/25/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2024
  • Hearing02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant); As to: Los Angeles United Investment Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketConfidential CASP Report; Filed by: Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim); Filed by: Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference; Filed by: Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by: Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Construction Related Accessibility Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant); Service Date: 03/05/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles United Investment Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/2021; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles United Investment Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles United Investment Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles United Investment Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Khatchik E. Tachtchian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNITED INVESTMENT CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE