This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 08:08:58 (UTC).

BRIAN JONATHAN THOMAS VS KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN LLP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 BRIAN JONATHAN THOMAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIMBALL, TIREY ST JOHN LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0712

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS BRIAN JONATHAN

Defendants

KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

5/12/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/12/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/12/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brian Jonathan Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Brian Jonathan Thomas on 05/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Brian Jonathan Thomas as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brian Jonathan Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Kimball, Tirey & St John LLP (Defendant); Marina Pacific Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP is a litigant