This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 22:08:11 (UTC).

BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE VS TEAM HEALTH

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEAM HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4993

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE

Defendant

TEAM HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A ESQ.

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/1/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/1/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/1/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/1/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/1/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/31/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Brand Surgical Institute on 08/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Brand Surgical Institute as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brand Surgical Institute (Plaintiff); As to: Team Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brand Surgical Institute (Plaintiff); As to: Team Health (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brand Surgical Institute (Plaintiff); As to: Team Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brand Surgical Institute (Plaintiff); As to: Team Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brand Surgical Institute (Plaintiff); As to: Team Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brand Surgical Institute (Plaintiff); As to: Team Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Team Health Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE MEDICAL CENTER INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A