This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 02:18:23 (UTC).

BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC. VS RAPHAEL REYNOLDS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAPHAEL REYNOLDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0506

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC.

Defendant

REYNOLDS RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/24/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/24/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/24/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager)

6/23/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/23/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/23/2022

6/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/23/2022

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager)

8/23/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/23/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2022

8/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2022

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/23/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Non-Jury Trial) of 10/07/2022

10/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Non-Jury Trial) of 10/07/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/07/2022

10/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/07/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Non-Jury Trial)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager)

10/7/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

10/7/2022: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Black and White Garage Inc. on 05/24/2022, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial): Status Date changed from 10/07/2022 to 10/07/2022; Name Extension changed from (Non-Jury Trial) to (Non-Jury Trial); As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager); Filed by: Black and White Garage Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/07/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 10/07/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Non-Jury Trial) of 10/07/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager); Filed by: Black and White Garage Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/23/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (Neyda Campos, General Manager); Filed by: Black and White Garage Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/23/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Black and White Garage Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Raphael Reynolds (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less