This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:02:07 (UTC).

BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC VS BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN A. R. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0034

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN A. R. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLACK AND WHITE GARAGE INC

Defendant

BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/9/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/9/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/9/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2023

2/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2023

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Black and White Garage Inc on 01/09/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 02/23/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Black and White Garage Inc (Plaintiff); As to: BMW Financial Services (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lauren A. R. Lofton in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less