This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 08:04:52 (UTC).

BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP VS TERESA M. CUADRA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TERESA M CUADRA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1218

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP

Defendants

CUADRA TERESA M.

CUADRA AMANDA R.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

6/2/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/2/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/2/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service - $68.50

7/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service - $68.50

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service $68.50

7/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service $68.50

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/25/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/25/2022: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

7/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service $68.50

8/1/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service $68.50

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service - $68.50

8/29/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service - $68.50

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/22/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP on 06/02/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service - $68.50; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service $68.50; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09/22/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service - $68.50; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non Service: As To Parties: TERESA M. CUADRA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non Service $68.50: Exact Name changed from Declaration of Non Service to Declaration of Non Service $68.50; As To Parties: TERESA M. CUADRA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff); As to: TERESA M. CUADRA (Defendant); AMANDA R. CUADRA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less