*******1218
06/02/2022
Disposed - Dismissed
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Los Angeles, California
RICHARD F. WALMARK
BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP
CUADRA TERESA M.
CUADRA AMANDA R.
6/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol
6/2/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims
6/2/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
6/2/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol
7/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service - $68.50
7/15/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service $68.50
7/25/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
7/25/2022: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)
7/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]
8/1/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service $68.50
8/29/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service - $68.50
9/22/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP on 06/02/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/22/2022
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Non Service - $68.50; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Non Service $68.50; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
[-] Read LessDocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09/22/2022 08:30 AM
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Non Service - $68.50; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non Service: As To Parties: TERESA M. CUADRA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Declaration of Non Service $68.50: Exact Name changed from Declaration of Non Service to Declaration of Non Service $68.50; As To Parties: TERESA M. CUADRA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff); As to: TERESA M. CUADRA (Defendant); AMANDA R. CUADRA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East
[-] Read Less