Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 11:39:44 (UTC).

BERNICE DAVIS VS REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 BERNICE DAVIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0192

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS BERNICE

Defendant

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/5/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

4/5/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/18/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • Hearing05/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Bernice Davis (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party was rescheduled to 05/20/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bernice Davis (Plaintiff); As to: Real Time Resolutions INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Real Time Resolutions INC (Defendant) to Real Time Resolutions INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a litigant