This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2023 at 03:07:23 (UTC).

BERNADETTE SAVA VS HUNT & HENRIQUES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 BERNADETTE SAVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUNT HENRIQUES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0994

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAVA BERNADETTE

Defendant

HUNT & HENRIQUES INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/27/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/27/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/27/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol;

3/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol;

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/1/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2023

5/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/01/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bernadette Sava on 02/27/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bernadette Sava (Plaintiff); As to: Hunt & Henriques, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less