Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 00:10:21 (UTC).

BENJAMIN EUGENE ROMIG VS UTILITY TREE SERVICE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 BENJAMIN EUGENE ROMIG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UTILITY TREE SERVICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMIG BENJAMIN EUGENE

Defendants

UTILITY TREE SERVICE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/18/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/20/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: BENJAMIN EUGENE ROMIG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by BENJAMIN EUGENE ROMIG on 01/20/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by BENJAMIN EUGENE ROMIG as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BENJAMIN EUGENE ROMIG (Plaintiff); As to: UTILITY TREE SERVICE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UTILITY TREE SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant