This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 22:46:22 (UTC).

BEN SHAHBAZ VS HIGH PERFORMANCE HOUSE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 BEN SHAHBAZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HIGH PERFORMANCE HOUSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7042

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAHBAZ BEN

Defendant

HIGH PERFORMANCE HOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHBAZ JACOB A.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/28/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/27/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/27/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ben Shahbaz on 09/27/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ben Shahbaz as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ben Shahbaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ben Shahbaz (Plaintiff); As to: High Performance House (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ben Shahbaz (Plaintiff); As to: High Performance House (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ben Shahbaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ben Shahbaz (Plaintiff); As to: High Performance House (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHBAZ JACOB A