Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 06:13:22 (UTC).

BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF FIRST TRUCKING XTREME VS WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 BAXTER, BAILEY, ASSOCIATES, INC , A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF FIRST TRUCKING XTREME filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4306

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES INC. A CORPORATION AN ASSIGNEE OF FIRST TRUCKING XTREME

Defendants

WORLD CLASS FREIGHT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OFFICE DEPOT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LEFT LANE LOGISTICS. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons (Joint Debtor)

4/8/2021: Summons - Summons (Joint Debtor)

Complaint - Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • Hearing04/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons ON COMPLAINT: Name Extension: ON COMPLAINT; Document changed from Summons (Joint Debtor) to Summons; As To Parties changed from LEFT LANE LOGISTICS., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION (Defendant), OFFICE DEPOT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant), WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant) to WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant), LEFT LANE LOGISTICS., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION (Defendant), OFFICE DEPOT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF FIRST TRUCKING XTREME (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); OFFICE DEPOT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); LEFT LANE LOGISTICS., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons ON COMPLAINT; Issued and Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF FIRST TRUCKING XTREME (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); OFFICE DEPOT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); LEFT LANE LOGISTICS., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF FIRST TRUCKING XTREME (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD CLASS FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); OFFICE DEPOT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); LEFT LANE LOGISTICS., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE DEPOT/OFFICE MAX is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD CLASS FREIGHT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT RICHARD