This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 12:49:36 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS TENLEY MYERS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TENLEY MYERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9117

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

MYERS TENLEY

Los Angeles, CA 90007-2049

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WACHTMAN JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/6/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/6/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/31/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/31/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

1/31/2023: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration 1033

1/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration 1033

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

2/1/2023: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. on 12/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. against Defendant TENLEY MYERS on the Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. on 12/06/2022 for the principal amount of $6,809.72 and costs of $314.27 for a total of $7,123.99.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TENLEY MYERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TENLEY MYERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration 1033; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to TENLEY MYERS; On the Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. on 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TENLEY MYERS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/09/2022; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TENLEY MYERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TENLEY MYERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TENLEY MYERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less