Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 05:06:49 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS RONALD W MORGAN

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RONALD W MORGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9746

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

MORGAN RONALD W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

6/30/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/30/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

7/8/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD W MORGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD W MORGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to RONALD W MORGAN; On the Complaint filed by Bank of America N.A. on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Bank of America N.A. against Defendant RONALD W MORGAN on the Complaint filed by Bank of America N.A. on 03/15/2021 for the principal amount of $11,512.00 and costs of $437.00 for a total of $11,949.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD W MORGAN (Defendant); Service Date: 03/31/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD W MORGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD W MORGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: RONALD W MORGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ANTHONY DIPIERO