Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 04:45:37 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS LUCY G SEH

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUCY G SEH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9724

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

SEH LUCY G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

5/11/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/11/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re:1033

5/11/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re:1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/13/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

4/1/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy G Seh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. against Defendant Lucy G Seh on the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on 03/15/2021 for the principal amount of $10,627.78 and costs of $540.62 for a total of $11,168.40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on 03/15/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Bank of America, N.A., does 1-10, only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re:1033; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lucy G Seh; On the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy G Seh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration Declaration of Non-Service: As To Parties: Lucy G Seh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy G Seh (Defendant); Service Date: 03/30/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy G Seh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy G Seh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Lucy G Seh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard