Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 05:18:32 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS LEYA RACHEL OAKLEY

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEYA RACHEL OAKLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1548

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

OAKLEY LEYA RACHEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMMELMAN JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/21/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/25/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/25/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on 03/25/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Bank of America, N.A. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Leya Rachel Oakley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Leya Rachel Oakley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Leya Rachel Oakley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Kimmelman