*******5026
02/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Los Angeles, California
LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS
BANK OF AMERICA N.A.
RAMAGE JAN RUTH
WACHTMAN JEREMY
2/24/2023: Complaint - Complaint
2/24/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint
2/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
2/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
2/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
3/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Hearing03/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JAN RUTH RAMAGE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/03/2023; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JAN RUTH RAMAGE (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JAN RUTH RAMAGE (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JAN RUTH RAMAGE (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse
[-] Read Less