Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 12:18:21 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS FRED LAY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRED LAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9432

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

LAY FRED

Culver City, CA 90230-4933

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

4/26/2021: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/26/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

4/27/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

5/11/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration 1033

5/11/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/11/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/22/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration 1033; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Fred Lay; On the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A. on 03/15/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Bank of America, N.A., does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Lay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Fred Lay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Lay (Defendant); Service Date: 03/23/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Lay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Lay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Lay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Lay (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard