This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 10:15:16 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS CHARLIE TRANQUILINO

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLIE TRANQUILINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5904

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

TRANQUILINO CHARLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/16/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/16/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. on 07/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CHARLIE TRANQUILINO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/11/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CHARLIE TRANQUILINO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CHARLIE TRANQUILINO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CHARLIE TRANQUILINO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard