This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2021 at 01:01:01 (UTC).

AZUSA MHP VS SEAN FLORES

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 AZUSA MHP filed an Other lawsuit against SEAN FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0437

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AZUSA MHP

Respondent

FLORES SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TREVILLYAN JONATHAN T.

Respondent Attorney

CIPRIANO ROBERT F

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/10/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED

2/10/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/10/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Response to Petition - Response to Petition

2/22/2021: Response to Petition - Response to Petition

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: NOTICE OF MOTION TO TAX, STRIKE COSTS, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION

6/17/2021: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: NOTICE OF MOTION TO TAX, STRIKE COSTS, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/17/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JONATHAN T TREVILLYAN

6/17/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JONATHAN T TREVILLYAN

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO RESPONDENT ALISON FLORES' MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS OF SUIT INCLUDING STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES

6/15/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO RESPONDENT ALISON FLORES' MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS OF SUIT INCLUDING STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

6/10/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees

6/10/2021: Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF FILING OF DISMISSAL

5/25/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF FILING OF DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/10/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Hearing10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMotion re: NOTICE OF MOTION TO TAX, STRIKE COSTS, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION; Filed by: Azusa MHP (Petitioner); As to: Sean Flores (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JONATHAN T TREVILLYAN; Filed by: Azusa MHP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Azusa MHP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Tax Costs scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOpposition TO RESPONDENT ALISON FLORES' MOTION FOR AWARD OF COSTS OF SUIT INCLUDING STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES; Filed by: Azusa MHP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 10/26/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Sean Flores (Respondent); As to: Sean Flores (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Sean Flores (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAddress for JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by Azusa MHP on 02/10/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Azusa MHP as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition; Filed by: Sean Flores (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Azusa MHP (Petitioner); As to: Sean Flores (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPetition TO DECLARE MOBILE HOME ABANDONED; Filed by: Azusa MHP (Petitioner); As to: Sean Flores (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CIPRIANO ROBERT FRANK