Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 05:39:18 (UTC).

AUTOVEST LLC VS RICARDO BERUMEN

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 AUTOVEST LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RICARDO BERUMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3849

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST LLC

Defendant

BERUMEN RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNSTAD BRYANT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

4/7/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • Hearing04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Autovest LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Berumen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Autovest LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Berumen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Autovest LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Berumen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Autovest LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Ricardo Berumen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOVEST, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnstad, Bryant