Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2021 at 14:53:08 (UTC).

AUTOVEST LLC VS EDWIN ZARAGOZA

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 AUTOVEST LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDWIN ZARAGOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5494

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST LLC

Defendant

ZARAGOZA EDWIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNSTAD BRYANT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AUTOVEST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN ZARAGOZA (Defendant); Service Date: 03/12/2021; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from EDWIN ZARAGOZA (Defendant) to EDWIN ZARAGOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AUTOVEST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN ZARAGOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AUTOVEST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN ZARAGOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AUTOVEST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN ZARAGOZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOVEST, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnstad, Bryant