This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 01:21:22 (UTC).

ATLEE GALLIMORE VS BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 ATLEE GALLIMORE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1973

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLIMORE ATLEE

Defendant

BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/13/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/13/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/13/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

1/31/2022: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/31/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/31/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/28/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/17/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Atlee Gallimore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Atlee Gallimore on 12/13/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Atlee Gallimore as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2022 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/05/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: BMW Financial Services LLC (Defendant); Mailing Date: 01/28/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: BMW Financial Services LLC (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Atlee Gallimore (Plaintiff); As to: BMW Financial Services LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 15.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Atlee Gallimore (Plaintiff); As to: BMW Financial Services LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2022 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant