This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:53:55 (UTC).

ASHLEY METZGER VS FABFAD INC.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 ASHLEY METZGER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FABFAD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1484

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METZGER ASHLEY

Defendant

FABFAD INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

4/18/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/18/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/18/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/15/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/15/2022

6/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/15/2022

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

6/24/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department 1A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Ashley Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08/18/2022 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ashley Metzger (Plaintiff); As to: FABFAD Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FABFAD INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant