This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 04:19:19 (UTC).

ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY VS DANIEL TYRONE SCOTT

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL TYRONE SCOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7379

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendant

SCOTT DANIEL TYRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/3/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/3/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

11/3/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/3/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/3/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/3/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/4/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2025
  • Hearing11/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2024
  • Hearing05/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Artisan And Truckers Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Tyrone Scott (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost: 94.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Artisan And Truckers Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Tyrone Scott (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Artisan And Truckers Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Tyrone Scott (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Artisan And Truckers Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Tyrone Scott (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Artisan And Truckers Casualty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Tyrone Scott (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less