This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 22:27:49 (UTC).

ARIES MCCARTHER VS RENE MANZANO CHAVEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 ARIES MCCARTHER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RENE MANZANO CHAVEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5994

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCARTHER ARIES

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CHAVEZ RENE MANZANO

GABAIE ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN BRUCE

Defendant Attorney

FAIRCHILD DARA

Other Attorneys

LIRA SANDY V.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

9/14/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

9/14/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/14/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

10/13/2022: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

11/18/2022: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons Cross

11/18/2022: Summons - Summons Cross

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

11/18/2022: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2025
  • Hearing09/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2024
  • Hearing03/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from Albert Gabaie (Defendant) to Albert Gabaie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); As to: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint Cross; Filed by: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); As to: Albert Gabaie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons Cross; Issued and Filed by: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); As to: Albert Gabaie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); Service Date: 10/19/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Albert Gabaie (Defendant); As to: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Gabaie (Defendant); Service Date: 09/30/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); Albert Gabaie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); Albert Gabaie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Aries McCarther (Plaintiff); As to: Rene Manzano Chavez (Defendant); Albert Gabaie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIRA SANDY V.