This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 18:00:59 (UTC).

ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS ADRIAN ROSAS COSTILLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ADRIAN ROSAS COSTILLA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6846

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

COSTILLA ADRIAN ROSAS

HERNANDEZ FREDDY SANCHEZ

NAVARRO AN INDIVIDUAL LUIS AKA LUIS DANIEL NAVARRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

10/12/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/12/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/12/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/12/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/12/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/28/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/1/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2025
  • Hearing10/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2024
  • Hearing04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LUIS NAVARRO , an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation on 10/12/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation as to FREDDY SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FREDDY SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketAddress for Todd F. Haines (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ADRIAN ROSAS COSTILLA (Defendant); FREDDY SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ADRIAN ROSAS COSTILLA (Defendant); FREDDY SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ARCHDIOCESES OF LOS ANGELES INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ADRIAN ROSAS COSTILLA (Defendant); FREDDY SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less