Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 05:16:46 (UTC).

ARACELI JIMENEZ AGUILAR VS HSIAOHSIA FEI

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ARACELI JIMENEZ AGUILAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HSIAOHSIA FEI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0089

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR ARACELI JIMENEZ

Defendant

FEI HSIAOHSIA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/16/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

1/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • Hearing05/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of remote appearance and exchange and submission of evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Araceli Jimenez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Hsiaohsia Fei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Araceli Jimenez Aguilar (Plaintiff); Hsiaohsia Fei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Araceli Jimenez Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Hsiaohsia Fei (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/07/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Araceli Jimenez Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Hsiaohsia Fei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less