This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 18:18:25 (UTC).

ANYTIME RENT A CAR, INC. VS JAKE KAIL

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 ANYTIME RENT A CAR, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAKE KAIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2266

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ANYTIME RENT A CAR INC. DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

KAIL JAKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PARVANEH ALI ESQ.

PARVANEH ALI

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

FELTON JAMES RICHARD ESQ.

FELTON JAMES R.

Other Attorneys

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

11/5/2021: Answer - Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to C...) of 10/27/2021

10/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to C...) of 10/27/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to C...)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to C...)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of James R. Felton in Response to Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint

10/25/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of James R. Felton in Response to Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Related Case Nos. 21STLC022...)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Related Case Nos. 21STLC022...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition

9/20/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/14/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

9/14/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Answer - Answer

8/10/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

8/10/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing

7/21/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

6/8/2021: Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

7/13/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of 07/15/2021

7/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of 07/15/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer (Cross): Name Extension: (Cross); As To Parties changed from Jake Kail (Cross-Complainant) to Jake Kail (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ali Parvaneh (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Jake Kail (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Plaintiff Jake Kail's Cross-Complaint: Filed By: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Result: Off Calendar; Result Date: 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to C...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to C...) of 10/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer to Cross-Complaint) scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/27/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of James R. Felton in Response to Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Jake Kail (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Consolidate Related Case Nos. 21STLC02266 with Smalls Claims Case No. 20VESC03092: Filed By: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 07/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Filed by: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Jake Kail (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Jake Kail (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anytime Rent A Car, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Jake Kail (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANYTIME RENT A CAR INC. DBA ANYTIME AUTO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS