This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 05:28:29 (UTC).

ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC VS INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5689

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC

Defendant

INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS DUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/6/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/6/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP585

9/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP585

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE CCP 1033

9/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE CCP 1033

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE INTEREST

9/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE INTEREST

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Judgment

10/5/2021: Judgment - Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

11/9/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 3290.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC against Defendant INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC on the Complaint filed by ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC on 07/06/2021 for the principal amount of $2,525.00, attorney fees of $250.00, interest of $105.25, and costs of $410.10 for a total of $3,290.35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration CCP585; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE CCP 1033; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration RE INTEREST; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC; On the Complaint filed by ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC on 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC on 07/06/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/2021; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: INTENTIONALLY BLANK LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANJAC FASHION BUILDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS DUSTIN