This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 02:25:15 (UTC).

ANGEL TILLMAN VS BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 ANGEL TILLMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0965

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TILLMAN ANGEL

Defendants

BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC.

GOLDEN MANAGEMENT INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/1/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/1/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/1/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/1/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/8/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/12/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

1/20/2023: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/7/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/7/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/9/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2023

3/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2023

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/9/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Angel Tillman against Defendant Bridge Management Inc. and Defendant Golden Management Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Angel Tillman on 12/01/2022 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $1,000.00, joint and several.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/09/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 03/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Bridge Management Inc. (Defendant); Golden Management Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Angel Tillman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Angel Tillman (Plaintiff); As to: Golden Management Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Angel Tillman (Plaintiff); As to: Bridge Management Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Angel Tillman (Plaintiff); As to: Bridge Management Inc. (Defendant); Golden Management Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Angel Tillman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marcelo D'Asero in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less